AIDS ARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the need among people subject to or affected by Human Immunodeficiency Virus (HIV), Acquired Immune Deficiency Syndrome (AIDS) and connected or similar conditions by providing or assisting in the provision of medical treatment and facilities in countries where such treatments are not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Burma
- Cambodia
- India
- South Africa
- Thailand
Governance
- 30 September 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Edmund Wilkins | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN JOHN FRANKLIN | Trustee | 16 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID PRIMOST | Trustee | 27 March 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.42k | £32.50k | £30.56k | £43.25k | £43.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.31k | £43.64k | £26.76k | £39.26k | £34.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24 SEPTEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") TO RELIEVE NEED AMONGST PEOPLE SUBJECT TO OR AFFECTED BY HUMANIMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS (HIV) ACQUIRED IMMUNE DEFICIENCY SYNDROME (AIDS) AND CONNECTED CONDITIONS PARTICULARLY BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL TREATMENT AND FACILITIES IN COUNTRIES WHERE SUCH TREATMENT IS NOT OTHERWISE AVAILABLE. (PLEASE SEE COPY OF THE DEED ON FILE FOR DETAILS).
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
98 West Heath Road
London
NW3 7TU
- Phone:
- 07968173336
- Email:
- info@aidsark.org
- Website:
-
aidsark.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window