KURDISH ASSOCIATION FOR REFUGEES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working with the Kurdish community in London and UK. Providing Information, advice and casework in the areas of Immigration, Welfare benefits, housing, health related issues and etc, a day centre for Kurdish Elders, Mother-tongue and supplementary classes for Kurdish Children and Youth, Cultural activities. The activities are mainly taking place in London
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 August 2003: Standard registration
- 06 June 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.54k | £14.69k | £2.28k | £1.27k | £516 | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.30k | £16.48k | £3.95k | £3.17k | £350 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 OCTOBER 1999
Charitable objects
A. SUPPORT THE KURDISH COMMUNITY TO SECURE THEIR RIGHTS AS REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS BY PROVIDING ADVICE, INTERPRETING, TRANSLATING AND CASE WORK TO ASSIST THEM TO TACKLE THE BARRIERS THEY MAY FACE BECAUSE OF THEIR LACK OF KNOWLEDGE OF THE NEW ENVIRONMENT, LANGUAGE PROBLEMS, DISCRIMINATION AND RACISM THAT THEY MAY EXPERIENCE. TO HELP THEM TO GAIN ASYLUM, SOCIAL SECURITY, HOUSING, EDUCATION AND HEALTH SERVICES. SEE GD FOR FURTHER DETAILS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window