Accounts and annual returns LEE VALLEY HOUSING ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity Number: 1095351
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 18 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 04 November 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 22 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 20 November 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 07 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 14 December 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 15 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 27 October 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 07 December 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 07 December 2004 On Time