AGE UK HEREFORD AND LOCALITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operating in Herefordshire . We deliver services that enable older people to remain independent and in their own homes. For example: Day Opportunities, Rural Men's Club, Coffee Mornings and Lunch Clubs, Information, Advice and Advocacy, Footcare Service, Reaching You Home Visiting Service, Reaching You Help at Home Service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Herefordshire
Governance
- AGE CONCERN HEREFORD AND LOCALITIES (Previous name)
- AGE CONCERN LEOMINSTER AND DISTRICT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Auer | Trustee | 12 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HUNT | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £206.14k | £167.26k | £205.75k | £153.73k | £230.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £189.72k | £167.70k | £167.15k | £227.14k | £335.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £60.30k | £60.30k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 100 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 100 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 April 2024 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 April 2024 | 69 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/03/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/12/2002 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24/07/2013 AS AMENDED ON 21 FEB 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28 APR 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND/OR OLDER PEOPLE WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT: 3.1.1 PREVENTING OR RELIEVING THE POVERTY OF OLDER PEOPLE; 3.1.2 ADVANCING EDUCATION; 3.1.3 PREVENTING OR RELIEVING SICKNESS, DISEASE OR SUFFERING IN OLDER PEOPLE (WHETHER EMOTIONAL, MENTAL OR PHYSICAL); 3.1.4 PROMOTING EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; 3.1.5 PROMOTING THE HUMAN RIGHTS OF OLDER PEOPLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS; 3.1.6 ASSISTING OLDER PEOPLE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH, SOCIAL EXCLUSION OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND 3.1.7 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF OLDER PEOPLE AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE; THE OUTCOME OF THIS BEING THE PROMOTION OF THE WELL-BEING OF OLDER PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
LEOMINSTER AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 10
Northern Lights Business Park
Clinton Road
LEOMINSTER
Herefordshire
HR6 0SW
- Phone:
- 0333 0066 299
- Email:
- contact@ageukhl.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window