Financial history FIRE FIGHTERS CHARITY

Charity number: 1093387
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.97m £8.27m £9.56m £9.65m £10.11m
Total expenditure £9.95m £8.74m £9.84m £11.94m £11.73m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £793.49k £1.13m £66.61k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £6.59m £5.57m £5.82m £5.59m £5.98m
Income - Other trading activities £2.86m £2.20m £3.20m £3.48m £3.55m
Income - Charitable activities £145.70k £137.08k £130.85k £130.47k £25.39k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £360.32k £359.59k £404.06k £443.72k £548.90k
Income - Other £7.95k £0 £5.44k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £812.17k £567.73k £1.19m £843.66k £725.21k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.77m £6.13m £6.42m £8.15m £8.49m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.19m £2.61m £3.42m £3.78m £3.24m
Expenditure - Governance £50.18k £31.53k £35.76k £44.09k £78.19k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £85.00k £86.40k £97.34k £89.68k £100.31k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0