Financial history NEW GENERATION EUROPE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1093811
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £96.00k
Total expenditure £726.91k £576.24k £499.55k £2.35m £5.39m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A