ABERGLASLYN MOUNTAIN RESCUE TEAM

Charity Number: 1094742
Charity reporting is up to date (176 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To relieve suffering and distress amongst persons endangered by accidents or natural hazards.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £30,862
Total expenditure: £37,830

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Gwynedd

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 November 2002: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Evans Chair 21 March 2022
None on record
Nia Jenkins Trustee 11 March 2019
None on record
ANDREW LEECH Trustee 30 March 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £24.61k £12.16k £15.01k £22.28k £30.86k
Total expenditure £23.57k £22.42k £11.37k £17.83k £37.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 April 2025 176 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 25 April 2025 176 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Aberglaslyn Mountain Rescue
Old Moelwyn Dairy
Penamser Road
Porthmadog
LL49 9NY
Phone:
01766515003