Financial history MAGIC MOMENTS

Charity number: 1096180
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £200.46k £91.77k £59.84k £180.11k £126.71k
Total expenditure £185.55k £21.03k £81.47k £155.87k £95.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A