Financial history THE GROVE GATEWAY CLUB

Charity number: 1095444
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.41k £7.75k £2.40k £9.27k £10.25k
Total expenditure £9.67k £6.65k £3.45k £7.77k £11.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A