WIRRAL BARN OWL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To encourage a viable population of breeding barn owls on the Wirral Peninsula by: (1) Collecting and collating barn owl sightings. (2) Locating, monitoring and protecting breeding pairs. (3) Visiting farmers and landowners to publicise barn owls and encourage habitat creation/protection. (4) Erecting nest boxes in areas of suitable habitat. (5) Liaising with local authority planning departments
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Wirral
Governance
- 23 September 2002: Standard registration
- WIRRAL AND ELLESMERE PORT BARN OWL TRUST (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEVEN PHILIP HARRIS | Chair | 09 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Frazer | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Ring | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ole Hansen | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Greenslade | Trustee | 31 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
NEIL EATON | Trustee | 28 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.95k | £4.52k | £2.89k | £5.97k | £4.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.24k | £3.98k | £4.82k | £4.56k | £6.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 FEBRUARY 2001 AS AMENDED 28 MARCH 2002 AND 29TH MAY 2003,AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 25TH NOVEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT ARE TO PROMOTE BIODIVERSITY AND THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY ENCOURAGING AVAILABLE POPULATION OF BREEDING WILD BARN OWLS (TY TO ALBA) IN THE AREAS COVERED BY THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF WIRRAL, THE CHESHIRE COUNTY BOROUGH OF ELLESMERE PORT AND NESTON AND TH PARTS OF THE CITY OF CHESTER TO THE WEST OF THE SHROPSHIRE UNION CANAL BETWEEN ELLESMERE PORT AND CHESTER CITY CENTRE
Area of benefit
METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF WIRRAL CXHESHIRE COUNTY BOROUGH OF ELLESMERE PORT, NESTON CITY OF CHESTER, WEST SHROPSHIRE UNION CANAL BETWEEN ELLESMERE PORT AND CHESTER CITY CENTRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Garage
2 Abbey Road
West Kirby
Wirral
CH48 7EW
- Phone:
- 07557 531 776
- Email:
- info@wirralbarnowltrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window