THE PRE-RAPHAELITE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PRE-RAPHAELITE SOCIETY AIMS TO ENCOURAGE THE STUDY OF THE WORKS AND LIVES OF, AND ALSO PROMOTE THE WIDER APPRECIATION OF, THE PRE-RAPHAELITE BROTHERHOOD AND THEIR SUCCESSORS. THE SOCIETY PUBLISHES ARTICLES RELATING TO THE P.R.B. AND THEIR SUCCESSORS, HOLDS LECTURES, AND ORGANISES VISITS TO PLACES OF INTEREST, INCLUDING IMPORTANT EXHIBITIONS OF NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL INTEREST.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Belgium
- Canada
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- Guernsey
- Hungary
- Ireland
- Italy
- Japan
- Netherlands
- Northern Ireland
- Russia
- Scotland
- Spain
- United States
Governance
- 18 December 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr SERENA TROWBRIDGE | Chair | 23 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Steven Oliver Greenwood | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rodrick Duncan McGregor | Trustee | 23 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Melodie Anne Robson | Trustee | 23 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karl Merrick | Trustee | 23 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tim McGee | Trustee | 23 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Elizabeth English | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elise Charlotte Victoria Ross | Trustee | 16 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katja Robinson | Trustee | 27 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL ADAMS | Trustee | 27 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHIMAINE JULIE ROSS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.21k | £12.21k | £11.13k | £10.06k | £11.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.06k | £11.89k | £10.85k | £13.93k | £11.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 11 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 OCTOBER 2001 AS AMENDED 19 OCTOBER 2002 AND 7 MAY 2005. as amended on 27 Oct 2018 as amended on 25 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE WORKS AND LIVES OF THE PRE-RAPHAELITE BROTHERHOOD AND THEIR SUCCESSORS LOCALLY, NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Shaw Lane
Stoke Prior
BROMSGROVE
Worcestershire
B60 4DP
- Phone:
- 01527837434
- Email:
- Serena.Trowbridge@bcu.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window