FRIENDS OF MYANMAR (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poverty among children and older people and provision of elementary education to children in Myanmar (Burma). To advance the Christian religion among Burmese people. Provision and management of residential accommodation for children in Burma who have been orphaned or who are unable to live with their parents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Burma
Governance
- 18 February 2003: Standard registration
- NEW VISION MINISTRIES (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CANON DAVID HAOKIP | Chair | 05 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
TINNU HAOKIP | Trustee | 05 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Norman Kendal | Trustee | 05 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET Mary GOODE | Trustee | 05 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.54k | £20.31k | £17.78k | £3.89k | £5.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.79k | £14.07k | £26.67k | £2.82k | £5.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/12/2002 AS AMENDED ON 02/05/2015
Charitable objects
1 TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONG CHILDREN AND ELDERLY WHOSE HOMELAND IS MYANMAR AND /OR WHOSE MOTHER TONGUE IS BURMESE 2 TO PROVIDE ELEMENTARY EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN WHOSE HOMELAND IS MYANMAR AND/OR WHOSE MOTHER TONGUE IS BURMESE 3 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AMONG BURMESE PEOPLE LIVING OUTSIDE MYANMAR, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL BASIS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.IN PRACTICE MYANMAE/INDIA AND UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Wick Point Mews
CHRISTCHURCH
BH23 1NZ
- Phone:
- 01202470518
- Email:
- revjr51@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window