One Housing Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Work with the homeless and disadvantaged to improve the quality of their lives by providing advice, opportunities and support in areas such as employment and training, financial management, health and education, leisure, sports and the arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 13 May 2003: Standard registration
- COMMUNITY ACTION LONDON (Working name)
- ARLINGTON FUTURES (Previous name)
- COMMUNITY ACTION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nathan Nathanial Gravesande | Chair | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Joanne Thorn | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Kate Louise Henderson | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.66m | £1.28m | £1.48m | £556.00k | £397.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.52m | £1.69m | £1.49m | £1.11m | £1.17m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £113.00k | £230.00k | £200.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £49.97k | £2.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.65m | £1.23m | £1.47m | £529.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £11.00k | £0 | £2.00k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £50.00k | £2.00k | £27.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.50m | £1.65m | £1.44m | £1.07m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £19.00k | £37.00k | £49.00k | £43.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £59.00k | £36.00k | £49.00k | £43.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/06/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/04/2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13/04/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/04/2012 as amended on 20 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONGST THE HOMELESS AND AMONGST THOSE IN NEED; 2. THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT; 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; 4. THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP: (I) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS OR (II) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES; 5. THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES OR EDUCATIONAL, LEISURE, SPORTS AND ARTS AND TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; AND 6. ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE RIVERSIDE GROUP LTD
2 ESTUARY BOULEVARD
SPEKE
LIVERPOOL
L24 8RF
- Phone:
- 0300 123 9966
- Email:
- foundation@onehousing.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window