TINY TIM'S CHILDREN'S CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides free therapy sessions for children with disabilities and special needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Leicestershire
- Solihull
- Warwickshire
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAULINE LUCKETT | Chair | 31 August 2016 |
|
|||||
Helen Rush Stainer | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lois Mary Thorpe | Trustee | 31 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Joyce Jarvis | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Mary Hemings | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
KEN BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £220.43k | £209.87k | £192.14k | £279.71k | £207.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £236.81k | £229.87k | £235.75k | £266.20k | £345.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.36k | N/A | £4.80k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15TH JULY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21ST AUGUST 2002. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION OF CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30TH AUGUST 2002 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30 APRIL 2003.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE TREATMENT, CARE, EDUCATION AND RELIEF FOR PERSONS WITH ANY FORM OF DISABILITY, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
TINY TIM'S CHILDREN CENTRE
WHITEFRIARS LANE
COVENTRY
CV1 2DT
- Phone:
- 02476228254
- Email:
- tinytimscharity@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window