FRIENDS OF EFFRA NURSERY SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provision and activities for families and carers from the local community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lambeth
Governance
- 30 August 2002: Standard registration
- 09 September 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 28 June 2017 | 148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 02 March 2016 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED EXECUTED 8 JULY 2002
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS") SHALL BE TO APPLY THE TRUST FUND TO OR FOR SUCH CHARITIES OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING): (A) TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING PHYSICAL AND SOCIAL TRAINING) OF CHILDREN ATTENDING THE SCHOOL (B) THE RELIEF OF NEED AND SICKNESS AND THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY AMONG CHILDREN ATTENDING THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window