THE DOWNS SCHOOL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activity of the charity is fundraising for the benefit of educational objectives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 18 October 2002: Standard registration
- 14 December 2023: Funds received from 1110684 FRIENDS OF THE DOWNS SCHOOL
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andy Tow | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Adam Chantler | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Clark | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chris Prosser | Trustee | 21 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.35k | £22.75k | £49.94k | £74.73k | £74.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.71k | £23.56k | £41.01k | £73.43k | £25.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.50k | £2.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22 JULY 2002.
Charitable objects
IN THE DOWNS SCHOOL, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AND OTHERS IN THE COMMUNITY, BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AT THE SCHOOL ITSELF AND ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
THE DOWNS SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Downs School
Compton
NEWBURY
Berkshire
rg20 6ad
- Phone:
- 01635270001
- Email:
- RBrophy@thedownsschool.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window