THE CAMBRIDGE FEDERATION OF TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Public affairs, Music Arts and Crafts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2020
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 19 August 2002: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOYCE LILLIAN ABRAHAM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SHEILA ANN TURNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOYCE WINIFRED JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET ANNE REVELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2016 | 31/01/2017 | 31/01/2018 | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.85k | £4.51k | £4.75k | £4.60k | £4.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.47k | £4.51k | £2.50k | £2.20k | £2.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 157 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 157 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 523 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 523 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 888 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 888 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1253 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1253 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 MARCH 2001
Charitable objects
SUCH PURPOSES GENERALLY AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND MORE SPECIFICALLY (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING):- 1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF WOMEN IRRESPECTIVE OF RACE CREED AND PARTY SO AS TO ENABLE THEM TO MAKE THE BEST CONTRIBUTION TOWARDS THE COMMON GOOD. 2. TO EDUCATE SUCH WOMEN IN THE PRINCIPLES OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND IN ALL PUBLIC QUESTIONS BOTH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY CARRYING OUT RESEARCH INTO ANY PUBLIC QUESTIONS WHETHER LOCAL NATIONAL OR INTERNATIONAL, AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. 4. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING OF ANY SUBJECT OF EDUCATIONAL VALUE WHERE WOMEN HAVE PARTICULAR KNOWLEDGE OR EXPERIENCE. 5. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR SUCH WOMEN IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
CAMBRIDGESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 METCALFE ROAD
CAMBRIDGE
CB4 2DD
- Phone:
- 01223353887
- Email:
- sheila.turner@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window