THE KAREN HILL TRIBES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to partner with Karen communities to improve their health, livelihoods, and access to education, namely to: 1) Enhance community health by improving sanitation, hygiene, and access to safe water 2) Secure sustainable livelihoods through increased food security and income generation. 3) Increase access to education for children and young adults to improve their opportunities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Animals
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Thailand
Governance
- 27 August 2002: Standard registration
- THE KAREN HILLTRIBES TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ed Holroyd - Pearce | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Robson | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matt Jenkins | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Donald Ballantine | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Heelham | Trustee | 12 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Chad Shampine | Trustee | 04 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Shurman | Trustee | 23 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jenifer Delaney | Trustee | 26 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD ELLIS | Trustee | 30 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £282.65k | £402.61k | £272.70k | £324.83k | £347.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £327.68k | £336.92k | £266.30k | £324.42k | £397.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 17 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 17 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 JULY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17 JANUARY 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 JAN 2022
Charitable objects
- TO IMPROVE THE HEALTH, LIVELIHOODS, AND ACCESS TO EDUCATION OF KAREN COMMUNITIES IN NORTHERN THAILAND - ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE KAREN COMMUNITIES OF NORTHERN THAILAND
Area of benefit
NORTH WEST THAILAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
TOWER HOUSE BUSINESS CENTRE
FISHERGATE
YORK
YO10 4UA
- Phone:
- 01904373001
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window