ALDERTON VILLAGE POND AND GREEN

Charity Number: 1094916
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Maintenace of the village pond and green and the care of many species of ducks

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £455
Total expenditure: £537

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 December 2002: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JONATHAN VAUGHAN Chair
None on record
Stuart Townshend Trustee 10 March 2025
None on record
Manish Jadeja Trustee 10 March 2025
None on record
Jason NOY Trustee 06 May 2023
None on record
Benjamin Russell Trustee 18 December 2013
None on record
MR TONY WITT Trustee
ALDERTON VILLAGE HALL (WILTSHIRE)
Received: On time
JACK DOYLE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.85k £1.35k £920 £458 £455
Total expenditure £1.99k £712 £788 £537 £537
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FOURWAYS
THE STREET
ALDERTON
CHIPPENHAM
SN14 6NL
Phone:
07768361056
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available