Accounts and annual returns NORTH WALES MUSIC TUITION CHARITY

Charity number: 1094056
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2013 16 April 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2012 21 May 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 28 May 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2011 16 May 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 24 May 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2010 19 May 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 25 May 2011 On Time