REDBRIDGE SOMALI CONSORTIUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity is a non-profit organization dedicated to empowering underprivileged Somali youth by providing them with opportunities to engage in sports activities and receive academic tuition. We believe that every child, regardless of their background or socioeconomic status, deserves a chance to pursue their dreams and achieve their full potential.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Redbridge
Governance
- 24 June 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bashe Farah | Trustee | 30 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
BANA MOHAMED BANAFUNZI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMED AHMED HASSAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SAYID SHEIKH ABDULLAHI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.80k | £8.55k | £2.44k | £4.01k | £4.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.46k | £5.94k | £2.43k | £450 | £3.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 465 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 465 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 830 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 830 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1195 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1195 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1560 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1560 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 FEBRUARY 1999 AS AMENDED 29 APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE SOMALI COMMUNITY IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF REDBRIDGE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF AGE, SEX, RACE, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL STATUTORY, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR EDUCATION, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS OF MEMBERS OF THE SOMALI COMMUNITY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION, SUPPORT AND SUCH OTHER SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM NECESSARY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF REDBRIDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 Crown Road
ILFORD
Essex
IG6 1NF
- Phone:
- 07931564571
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window