THE KRYSALIS PROJECT LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities and support relating to mental health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Coventry City
Governance
- 17 December 2002: Standard registration
- 14 November 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE KRYSALIS PROJECT LIMITED (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.72k | £37.97k | £38.84k | £38.28k | £38.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.08k | £37.80k | £37.81k | £38.29k | £48.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 01 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 01 November 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 05 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 05 December 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 05 November 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 17 June 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 07 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 28 May 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28TH NOVEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25TH NOVEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF FOR THE BENEFIT OF MENTAL HEALTH SERVICE USERS IN THE CITY OF COVENTRY BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: . THE PROMOTION OF GOOD PRACTICE IN THE PROVISION OF MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES. . THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE, PEER COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT. . THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR DISCUSSION AMONG MENTAL HEALTH SERVICE USERS. . THE PROVISION OF ACCESS TO TRAINING AND EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES. . THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
CITY OF COVENTRY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window