Financial history THE KAY MASON FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1094073
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £61.54k £80.85k £191.43k £149.29k £76.52k
Total expenditure £52.27k £65.89k £189.05k £120.31k £130.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A