VISION FOR THE FUTURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Vision for the Future has assisted in the provision of treatment for those who are blind or suffering from eye related conditions and has provided facilities and equipment for eye care. In addition, it has assisted in the provision of advice and support for its patients, their families and carers. Other activities include the provision of advice and information on eye care for the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- India
- Nigeria
Governance
- 20 June 2003: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BHARATI CHANRAI | Trustee | 30 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
TINA POHOOMULL | Trustee | 30 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
JAGDISH CHANRAI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Devika Mokhtarzadeh | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12 JULY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 6 MAY 2003
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH FOR THOSE SUFFERING, OR AT RISK FROM SUFFERING, FROM EYE RELATED ILLNESS OR PROBLEMS IN PARTICULAR THOUGH NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN INDIA AND AFRICA BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS; A) THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF TREATMENT FOR THOSE WHO ARE BLIND OR SUFFERING FROM EYE RELATED CONDITIONS. B) THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT FOR EYE CARE. C) THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT FOR PATIENTS, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS. D) THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND INFORMATION ON EYE CARE FOR THE GENERAL PUBLIC INCLUDING WHERE APPROPRIATE RESEARCH PROJECTS TO FURTHER THAT PURPOSE.
Area of benefit
INDIA AND AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 35
Rossmore Court
Park Road
London
NW1 6XX
- Phone:
- 07886553970
- Email:
- liulily01@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window