GLEN TRAMWAY PRESERVATION COMPANY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preservation of a cable hauled Tramway opened in 1895 giving passenger rides on a 350m twin 20" track with a tram carriage on each track. Has a museum displaying the history of the Tramway and of the local area including Shipley Glen at the bottom station & at the top station traditional Sweet Shop. A short walk from the World Heritage Site of Saltaire Run entirely by volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bradford City
Governance
- 22 October 2002: Standard registration
- SHIPLEY GLEN TRAMWAY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DALE SMITH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Fiona Julie Lidstone-Green | Trustee | 05 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Norman Hay | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alec Copland | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Joseph Ashton | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Coles | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Letitia Anne Lawson | Trustee | 22 May 2017 |
|
|||||
JOHN PITCHER | Trustee | 05 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.61k | £23.24k | £29.23k | £50.85k | £60.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.61k | £34.07k | £26.74k | £46.87k | £44.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 06 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 06 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 DECEMBER 2001. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE THE GLEN TRAMWAY AND TO MAINTAIN AND PROTECT THE STRUCTURES, BUILDINGS, PLANT, TRAMS AND EQUIPMENT CONNECTED WITH THE TRAMWAY AS CRAFTSMANSHIP WORTHY OF PRESERVATION AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE HISTORY AND OPERATION OF FUNICULAR TRAMWAYS AND THE GLEN TRAMWAY IN PARTICULAR..
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 ASHFIELD DRIVE
BAILDON
SHIPLEY
BD17 6JE
- Phone:
- 01274530383
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window