THE TREVERBYN EDUCATION TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the education of children and young people from ages five to eighteen in particular by assistance to their parents to enable such children to be taught otherwise than at school as defined in the Education Acts 1944 to 1993.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Cornwall
Governance
- 15 October 2002: Standard registration
- 08 December 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 08 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 08 January 2020 | 192 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 JULY 2002.
Charitable objects
(I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE FROM AGES FIVE TO EIGHTEEN IN PARTICULAR BY ASSISTANCE TO THEIR PARENTS TO ENABLE SUCH CHILDREN TO BE TAUGHT OTHERWISE THAN AT SCHOOL AS DEFINED IN THE EDUCATION ACTS 1944 TO 1993; (II) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE BRETHREN
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE TREVERBYN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window