THE PTA OF TWO GATES COMMUNITY PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1093572
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

School disco's, Summer and Christmas fairs.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £5,135
Total expenditure: £4,546

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Staffordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 August 2002: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lynette Brelsforth Trustee 17 November 2022
None on record
Rachael Griffin Trustee 17 November 2022
None on record
NEST LLEWELYN-COOK Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £2.42k £1.56k £1.08k £7.35k £5.14k
Total expenditure £3.18k £1.26k £2.71k £5.62k £4.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 12 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 22 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 09 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 19 October 2022 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 February 2022 237 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
25 Avill
Hockley
TAMWORTH
Staffordshire
B77 5QE
Phone:
01827750235
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available