Accounts and annual returns CHAMBER DOMAINE LIMITED

Charity Number: 1095029
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2023 15 August 2024 137 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 27 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 24 February 2023 330 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 07 April 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required