SANGAT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Day Centre for the elderly Male/Female. Study Support for children Asian Adults with Learning Disabilities. Welfare/Immigration Advice. Job Club & IT Classes ESOL Classes Exercise Classes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £12,117 from 1 government contract(s) and £407,755 from 5 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bradford City
Governance
- 28 November 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Merban Hussain | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Nessa | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Azam | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Asif Yaseen | Trustee | 16 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Raza Israil Mr | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
SHAFIQ AHMED MALIK | Trustee | 28 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
NASRAIN ALI | Trustee | 21 December 2011 |
|
|||||
SHAMIMA TAHIR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED MANIR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ABDUL GHAFOOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
YOUNIS QAMAR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £154.07k | £254.52k | £198.14k | £302.98k | £492.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £144.58k | £233.17k | £228.63k | £213.72k | £467.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £9.39k | £12.12k | |
|
Income from government grants | £95.70k | £232.92k | £112.46k | £177.20k | £407.76k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 APRIL 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 23 SEPTEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF KEIGHLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE ASIAN INHABITANTS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE SANGAT CENTRE) AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME, WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION IN WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
KEIGHLEY, BRADFORD METROPOLITAN BOROUGH, WEST YORKSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sangat Centre
Marlborough Street
KEIGHLEY
BD21 3HU
- Phone:
- 01535610263
- Email:
- sangat1uk@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window