THE T R HEILPERN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of education in the Jewish religion and the relief of poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bury
- Salford City
Governance
- 04 April 2003: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 09 August 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CINDY HALPERN | Trustee | 08 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
SAMUEL HALPERN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
JOSHUA HALPERN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.00k | £25.37k | £31.25k | £0 | £2.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.27k | £19.54k | £22.50k | £20.98k | £5.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 19 August 2024 | 196 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 February 2023 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 27 February 2023 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 3 JULY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 3 MARCH 2003.
Charitable objects
1. ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE JEWISH RELIGION 2. RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST THE JEWISH COMMUNITY 3. FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Haffner Hoff Llp
2ND Floor Parkgates
Bury New Road
Prestwich
MANCHESTER
M25 0TL
- Phone:
- 01617981660
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window