Accounts and annual returns GIPSEY BRIDGE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1101174
Charity reporting is up to date (264 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 21 March 2025 264 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 21 March 2025 264 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 14 March 2025 623 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 14 March 2025 623 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 March 2025 988 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 14 March 2025 988 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 March 2025 1353 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 14 March 2025 1353 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 14 March 2025 1718 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 14 March 2025 1718 days late Download Open in new window