GIPSEY BRIDGE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE A SAFE LEARNING AND CARING ENVIRONMENT FOR CHILDREN AGED 2 TO 11. THE SETTING OPERATES ON A TERM TIME BASIS BETWEEN 7.30AM AND 6PM MONDAY TO FRIDAY. THE SETTING IS NOT OPEN IN THE SCHOOL HOLIDAYS. WE PROVIDE BEFORE AND AFTER SCHOOL CLUBS FOR CHILDREN FROM THREE LOCAL SCHOOL AND OFFER A PICK UP SERVICE. WE PROVIDE AN INCLUSIVE PROVISION FOR ALL.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £141,997 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 15 December 2003: Standard registration
- 16 April 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
- 05 January 2016: Re-registered
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maggie Everington-Ali | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Anderson | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maxine Holland | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Mitchell | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £128.86k | £99.46k | £150.29k | £152.72k | £210.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £121.22k | £112.43k | £127.07k | £171.80k | £233.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £106.76k | £106.97k | £142.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 March 2025 | 264 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 March 2025 | 264 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 March 2025 | 623 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 14 March 2025 | 623 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 March 2025 | 988 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 March 2025 | 988 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 March 2025 | 1353 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 14 March 2025 | 1353 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 14 March 2025 | 1718 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 14 March 2025 | 1718 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHTS OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND BECOMING INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS AND ABILITY (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO THE AIM OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
GIPSEY BRIDGE PRE SCHOOOL
LEAGATE ROAD
GIPSEY BRIDGE
BOSTON
PE22 7BU
- Phone:
- 01205 280921
- Email:
- gipseybridge@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window