Governing document CHANGING OUR LIVES LTD

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INCORPORATED 26/03/2002 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19/09/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/12/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/02/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY’S OBJECTS ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE AND SUPPORT PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL DISABILITIES, SENSORY DISABILITIES AND LEARNING DISABILITIES, AS WELL AS PEOPLE ON THE AUTISTIC SPECTRUM AND PEOPLE WITH MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS AND THEIR FAMILIES WHO ARE LIVING OR WORKING IN ENGLAND, WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THE WEST MIDLANDS, IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE EMPOWERED TO LEAD AS INDEPENDENT, FULL AND PRODUCTIVE A LIFE AS POSSIBLE AND MAXIMISE THEIR FULL POTENTIAL AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PHYSICAL, EMOTIONAL AND PSYCHOLOGICAL NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
WEST MIDLANDS WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF SANDWELL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.