CHRESTOS MISSION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Chrestos Mission operates principally among refugees of the Karen people in Thailand. It seeks to advance Christianity through missionary work and providing Christian literature and Bible classes, to relieve poverty, suffering and distress in accordance with Christian principles and to advance education by provision of classes in the English language, computer science and other subjects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Thailand
Governance
- 09 January 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY JOHN HARROP MA, MBA | Chair |
|
||||||
Allison Christine Fitter | Trustee | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE JENNIFER WELLS | Trustee | 05 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rosslyn Anne Hill | Trustee | 05 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Norman John Silverstone | Trustee | 13 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
REV EDWARD FRANK GOVEIA | Trustee | 05 November 2016 |
|
|||||
Peter Maycock | Trustee | 08 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
NEIL JOHN HARDY | Trustee | 11 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £181.53k | £100.01k | £152.47k | £90.39k | £218.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £150.81k | £140.25k | £118.79k | £118.32k | £142.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 1 AUGUST 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 7 DECEMBER 2002. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
"THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE:- 1. TO ADVANCE CHRISTIANITY BY SHOWING THE LOVE OF JESUS CHRIST, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH MISSIONARY WORK AND PROVIDING CHRISTIAN LITERATURE AND BIBLE CLASSES; 2. TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SUFFERING AND DISTRESS IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES, IN PARTICULAR BY CARING FOR THE SICK, TRAINING HEALTH WORKERS, AND PROVIDING MEDICINES, CLOTHING, BLANKETS AND FOOD; 3. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF CLASSES IN THE ENGLISH LANGUAGE, COMPUTER SCIENCE, AND OTHER SUBJECTS OF USE TO THOSE RECEIVING SUCH EDUCATION."
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE: OVERSEAS - THAILAND - CHIANG MAI.
Contact information
- Address:
-
72, Blenheim Crescent
South Croydon
CR2 6BP
- Phone:
- 07803703116
- Email:
- theaddressforjohn@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window