Trustees IF NOT NOW WHEN

Charity number: 1094558
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Aaron Ben Brett-Miller Trustee 20 March 2025
None on record
Haydn John Claridge Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Riel Karmy-Jones Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Margaret Joyce Claridge Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Stephanie Kershaw Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Morag Neeld Trustee 31 October 2019
None on record
Caroline Brett Trustee 30 October 2019
None on record
BELLE ELLEN JEBB JONES Trustee 01 May 2002
None on record
Hilary Bushell Trustee 01 May 2002
None on record
RUPERT ERIS Trustee 01 May 2002
None on record