HADLEY WOOD JEWISH COMMUNITY LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
the advancement of the Jewish faith, in particular, but not exclusively, through the provision of grants and the maintenance of a religious congregation for the advancement and promotion of teaching Judaism in Hadley Wood and srrounding areas and to provide residential accomodation for Minister or Rabbi , premises for the community Synagogue or other place of worship and amenity for the members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Other Finance
- Enfield
Governance
- 22 August 2003: Standard registration
- 15 November 2018: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 15 November 2018: Funds transferred to 242552 UNITED SYNAGOGUE
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2013 | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £200.18k | £28.09k | £2.98k | £19 | £48 | |
|
Total expenditure | £675.03k | £16.83k | £821 | £547 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | 19 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 01 March 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | 03 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 JUNE 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 27 JULY 2003.
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE JEWISH FAITH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, AND THE MAINTENANCE OF A RELIGIOUS CONGREGATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT AND PROMOTION OF THE PRACTICE OF TEACHING OF JUDAISM IN HADLEY WOOD AND SURROUNDING AREAS AND TO PROVIDE RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION FOR A MINISTER OR RABBI, PREMISES FOR THE COMMUNITY SYNAGOGUE OR OTHER PLACE OF WORSHIP AND AMENITY FOR THE MEMBERS. 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGIOUS EDUCATION IN HISTORY, CUSTOMS, LANGUAGE TENETS AND CULTURE OF JUDAISM ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND PRINCIPLES OF THE JEWISH RELIGION BY MEANS OF CLASSES, SEMINARS MEETING AND OTHERWISE. 3) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE WORK AS THE COUNCIL MAY CONSIDER FROM TIME TO TIME ADVISABLE.
Area of benefit
HADLEY WOOD AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window