KIDS N'ACTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Childrens educational activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £2,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
165 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Hackney
Governance
- 24 February 2003: Standard registration
- KIDS SCOPE (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
YUTTA DOMB | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
|||||||||
RABBI NOSSON BENJAMIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
GITTI ESTHER SPITZER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £187.93k | £156.87k | £206.88k | £284.97k | £148.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £210.08k | £177.18k | £191.11k | £246.60k | £155.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.05k | £15.00k | N/A | £2.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 23 May 2023 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 23 May 2023 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 20 01 2003
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE: 1) TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH. 2) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES AND PROGRAMMES FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE FOR THEIR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION AND SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, TO ENHANCE THEIR EMPLOYMENT PROSPECTS AND TO ASSIST THEM IN GROWING TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND AS MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY IMPROVE.
Area of benefit
HACKNEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Lynmouth Road
LONDON
N16 6XL
- Phone:
- 02036701441
- Email:
- knaforms@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window