Accounts and annual returns STAFFORD PAIRS (PREVENTING ABUSE IN RELATIONSHIPS) - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FORUM

Charity number: 1094549
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 March 2025 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 March 2025 406 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 March 2023 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 December 2022 315 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 February 2021 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required