HAFAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hafal provides information, advice, support and services of the highest standard to people recovering from serious mental illness, their families and carers, in areas such as housing, education and training, rehabilitation and employment and recreation. Members directly influence the Charity through the election of Trustees who manage and direct the Charity's work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout Wales
Governance
No other names
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Healthcare Inspectorate Wales (HIW)
- Welsh Government (Social Landlords And Housing Associations)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Dyfrig Morgan ap Dafydd | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
SIMON GREEN | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Howard Jones | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|||||||
CLIVE EDMUND WOLFENDALE | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.43m | £9.93m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.47m | £9.64m | £4.93m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £2.61m | £6.21m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.61m | £1.91m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £82.48k | £56.54k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £8.33m | £9.88m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £848 | £488 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £16.51k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £8.42m | £9.57m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £53.11k | £77.63k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £25.99k | £30.03k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 AUGUST 2002. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 31 MAR 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 31 MAR 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY TO (1) THE TREATMENT, CARE AND SUPPORT OF PERSONS SUFFERING DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY FROM PROBLEMS ASSOCIATED WITH ALCOHOL OR DRUG MISUSE AND OTHER DEPENDENCIES; AND (2) THE PREVENTION OF ALCOHOL AND DRUG MISUSE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SERVICES FOR THOSE SUFFERING FROM OR LIKELY TO SUFFER FROM SUBSTANCE MISUSE, ADDICTION OR OTHER DEPENDENCIES; AND (3) EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR PROFESSIONALS AND VOLUNTEERS IN THE FIELD AND RAISING THE AWARENESS OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE MEDIA AND THROUGH EDUCATION ABOUT THE INCIDENCE AND EFFECTS ON SOCIETY OF SUBSTANCE DEPENDENCY AND MISUSE AFFECTING WALES AND THE MARCHES; AND (4) THE SUPPORT, RELIEF AND TREATMENT OF PERSONS SUFFERING DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY FROM PROBLEMS ASSOCIATED WITH MENTAL HEALTH PSYCHOLOGICAL AND EMOTIONAL WELL-BEING, ILLNESS, AGE, SOCIAL EXCLUSION OR ECONOMIC INACTIVITY; AND (5) THE PROMOTION AND PROVISION OF ADVICE AND ADVOCACY FOR PERSONS SUFFERING DISADVANTAGE EITHER DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY FROM THE PROBLEMS CAUSED BY AND THE CONSEQUENCES OF ALCOHOL AND DRUG MISUSE AND OTHER DEPENDENCIES, DISABILITY, ILLNESS, AGE OR SOCIAL EXCLUSION.
Area of benefit
WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Adferiad Recovery Ltd
Ty Dafydd Alun
36 Princes Drive
Colwyn Bay
Conwy
LL29 8LA
- Phone:
- 01492 863000
- Email:
- info@adferiad.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window