THE PARMITER'S SCHOOL PARENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity organises and runs events within the school environment and supports school activities, which raises funds for a wide variety of adopted charities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 18 October 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gregory Longmore | Chair | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tina Jayne Canning | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ozana Silvia Dragomir | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Martina Lynda Pool | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.16k | £28.25k | £11.65k | £29.70k | £21.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.95k | £195 | £322 | £7.31k | £30.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 13 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 23 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 23 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 29 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 29 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 JULY 2002.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION ("THE OBJECTS") IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS. PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH FACILITIES OR ITEMS FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT PROVIDED FROM STATUTORY FUNDS) AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
HERTFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
PARMITERS SCHOOL
HIGH ELMS LANE
WATFORD
WD25 0UU
- Phone:
- 01923 671424
- Email:
- pa@parmiters.herts.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window