Trustees THE STAMFORD MERCURY ARCHIVE TRUST
Charity number: 1111011

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIPPA JANE MASSEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Michael Robert Atkinson | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lea Rickard | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cllr RICHARD JAMES CLEAVER | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr NICHOLAS JOHN SHEEHAN | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HOPSON | Trustee | 05 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Torrin Philip John Clark | Trustee | 10 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Critchard | Trustee | 02 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP ROBSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.