THE LIFETIME CHILDREN'S TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Lifetime Children's Trust works closely with The Lifetime Service, a unique Bath-based community nursing and support programme for children with life threatening or long term illnesses and their families. It funds the provision of equipment, facilities and support services not normally provided by the statutory authorities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 03 January 2003: Standard registration
- 26 August 2021: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.75k | £7.75k | £1.02k | £916 | £1.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.81k | £9.81k | £5.84k | £2.64k | £3.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 November 2020 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 20 December 2019 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 05 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 NOVEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF CHILDREN BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SUPPORT SERVICES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE BATH AND NORTH EAST SOMERSET, WILTSHIRE NORTH SOMERSET BRISTOL AND SOUTH GLOUSTERSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window