Accounts and annual returns MILTON ABBAS SURGERY PATIENT PARTICIPATION GROUP

Charity number: 1098867
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2013 16 May 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2013 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2012 16 May 2013 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2012 Not Required
Annual return 10 April 2011 25 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 10 April 2011 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2010 25 August 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2010 Not Required