Trustees CHARD, ILMINSTER AND DISTRICT U3A
Charity number: 1096163

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mx Michelle Miller | Trustee | 19 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simon Thomson | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Wallis | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Le-Taylor | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Young | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lilly Sell-Dunkley | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Hounsell | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Lake | Trustee | 15 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Walmsley | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Lobley | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.