SRI LANKA ISLAMIC (UK) ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As per our constitution.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 June 2003: Standard registration
- SLIA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ghanzanfar Hameed | Chair | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shamila Nalimdeen-Ryan | Trustee | 27 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed Nissther Annis | Trustee | 04 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Abdul Hashim Mohamed Hilmy | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ahamed Hussain Wahab | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Khalid Malhar | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.32k | £16.22k | £34.15k | £60.87k | £25.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.20k | £19.99k | £40.46k | £71.82k | £15.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 JULY 2002 AS AMENDED 1 JUNE 2003 AS AMENDED 26 MARCH 2006 as amended on 26 May 2019 as amended on 29 May 2019 as amended on 04 Jul 2021 as amended on 27 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE MUSLIM RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AMONG MUSLIMS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM INCLUDING BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PRAYER GATHERING B) TO ADVANCE ISLAMIC EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC C) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST MUSLIM STUDENTS D) TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY OF SUFFERING COMMUNITIES WORLDWIDE BY FACILITATING HUMANITARIAN ACTIVITIES AND SUPPORTING WELFARE PROJECTS FOR THE SOCIAL UPLIFTMENT OF POOR COMMUNITIES IN SRI LANKA.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 BROADWAY BUILDINGS
BOSTON ROAD
LONDON
W7 3TT
- Phone:
- 07956262600
- Email:
- info@slia.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window