CHM CHRIST HOSPITAL MINISTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CARING FOR THE SICK, PROVIDING A HOLISTIC MINISTRY OF CARE AND SUPPORT FOR THE SICK. VISIT THE SICK IN VARIOUS HOSPITALS AND THEIR HOMES, PROVIDING HELP FOR THEM THROUGH PRAYER, ENCOURAGEMENT, AND COUNSELLING. PROVIDING REHABILITATION, MEDICAL CAMP, HEALTH AWARENESS, PUBLIC HEALTH SEMINARS AND HELP-LINE ( HANDLES CALLS FROM THE SICK OR THEIR RELATIVE ) AT ALL TIMES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
43 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ghana
- India
- Nigeria
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- Sierra Leone
- South Africa
- United States
- Zambia
Governance
- 17 May 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVD SAMUEL AJIBOLA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rev DAVID ABIOLA GORIOLA | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARION EGERTINA ROLLINGS-KAMARA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
OMOTOLA ADEFISAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOYCE OLAMIBOSIPO AKINOLA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FRANK EMUAKPOR ORHURHU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FLORENCE OLUKEMI BANKOLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WASIU OLUFEMI ABIODUN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LAWRENCE FAWEHINMI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR OLUGBENGA OLUDARE SOFOWORA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.98k | £24.12k | £22.87k | £23.12k | £23.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.94k | £17.26k | £17.72k | £18.04k | £18.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 FEBRUARY 2002.
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT (C) TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
LONDON, UNITED KINGDOM AND WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Baron Close
GILLINGHAM
Kent
ME7 1TH
- Phone:
- 07951475829
- Email:
- sam_ajibola@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window