WALSALL SHOP MOBILITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides mobility aids to the elderly and disabled to enable them to go about their business and shop.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Walsall
Governance
- 22 November 2002: Standard registration
- 18 March 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2005 | 30/06/2006 | 30/06/2007 | 30/06/2008 | 30/06/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.13k | £1.20k | £9.04k | £7.78k | £7.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.68k | £16.04k | £14.40k | £7.80k | £6.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2009 | 06 March 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2008 | 20 February 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2007 | 15 April 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2007 | 15 April 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 JUNE 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 1 OCTOBER 2002.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES AND MOBILITY DIFFICULTIES IN WALSALL BY PROVIDING PERSONAL ASSISTANCE, WHEELCHAIRS AND OTHER MOBILITY AIDS AND EQUIPMENT FOR USE IN THE TOWN CENTRE OF WALSALL, AND ALSO TO PROVIDE A FULLY ACCESSIBLE MEETING PLACE, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR MOBILITY ACCESS TO SERVICES AND QUALITY OF LIFE, THEREBY PARTICIPATING FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
WALSALL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window