Financial history ELEM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1094325
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £63.24k £70.49k £43.13k £83.15k £49.21k
Total expenditure £61.62k £61.05k £67.26k £63.21k £64.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A