KING'S CHURCH UPMINSTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian Religion in Essex and in localities in England and Wales. To provide assistance for aged persons, persons in need or sick and relieve the distress arising therefrom. To advance the education of children and adults. To promote and fulfil such other charitable purposes as the trustees think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 03 February 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STUART SUTCLIFFE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
TREVOR QUENTIN LEAMAN | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
JAMES PAUL CAMPBELL DRURY | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAUL COLIN WILLIAM THOMPSON | Trustee | 25 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.01k | £61.85k | £63.08k | £55.86k | £75.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.59k | £36.10k | £38.97k | £49.47k | £51.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25TH JULY 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION TO PROCLAIM AND FURTHER THE GOSPEL OF GOD AND HIS SON JESUS CHRIST AND BY PREACHING AND TEACHING THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, B) TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE FOR AGED PERSONS AND PERSONS IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS ARISING THEREFROM WHETHER IN CONNECTION WITH HOUSING OR ACCOMMODATION OR SHELTER OR ANY OTHER PURPOSE (WHETHER BY WAY OF LOAN GIFT THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION OR SHELTER IN ANY OTHER WAY), C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION WHETHER OF CHILDREN (ABOVE OR BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE) OR OF ADULTS, D) TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
111 Cranston Park Avenue
UPMINSTER
RM14 3XJ
- Phone:
- 07594712402
- Email:
- paul@pmthompson.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window