THE RATTAN LAL JAIN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Building, maintaining and developing educational facilities in India. Awarding grants and educational sponsorship to under privileged children. General charitable work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- India
Governance
- 14 January 2003: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANIL KUMAR JAIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NEHA JAIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DARSHAN JAIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUNIL KUMAR JAIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS REKHA JAIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.05k | £1.77k | £796 | £3.48k | £680 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.10k | £1.00k | £0 | £3.00k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 30 March 2022 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 30 March 2022 | 418 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 MAY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 14 JANUARY 2003.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BOTH IN THE UK AND ABROAD, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HINDU RELIGION, CULTURE AND ARTS.
Area of benefit
UK AND ABROAD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 ORMONDE AVENUE
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE15 7AH
- Phone:
- 07813181310
- Email:
- sunil@givetoeducation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window